CT SB01101 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-03 - House Calendar Number 721
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-03 - House Calendar Number 721
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require a review of any improvements to the operations, conditions, culture and finances of Whiting Forensic Hospital and Connecticut Valley Hospital.
Title
An Act Concerning An Evaluation Of Hospitals Operated By The Department Of Mental Health And Addiction Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 304 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | House | House Calendar Number 721 |
2019-06-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-06-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | File Number 740 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 361 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |