CT SB01105 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To authorize the nondisclosure of the names, addresses and identifying information of victims of sexual assault and family violence contained in law enforcement records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Confidentiality Of Law Enforcement Records Concerning Victims Of Sexual Assault And Family Violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 312 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 81 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-12SenatePublic Act 19-43
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed
2019-04-29SenateHouse Calendar Number 519
2019-04-29SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-25SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-17SenateFile Number 743
2019-04-17SenateSenate Calendar Number 343
2019-04-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-21SenatePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback