CT SB01109 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - File Number 806
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To ban the use of solitary confinement in correctional facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Solitary Confinement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateFile Number 806
2019-04-25SenateSenate Calendar Number 398
2019-04-25SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-25SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-11SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-09SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-09SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-09SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-25SenatePublic Hearing 03/29
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback