CT SB01110 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To provide for the fair and equitable adjudication of a claim filed by or on behalf of an inmate for death or permanent injuries suffered while incarcerated at an institution or facility of the Department of Correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Access To Medical Records In The Possession Of The Commissioner Of Correction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 316 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 266 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-18SenatePublic Act 19-80
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-01SenateHouse Calendar Number 700
2019-06-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-30SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-30SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-30SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10229
2019-04-18SenateFile Number 766
2019-04-18SenateSenate Calendar Number 369
2019-04-18SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-18SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-10SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-29SenatePublic Hearing 04/03
2019-03-25SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback