CT SB01114 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure that the Department of Correction provides adequate payment to a municipality for ambulance services that are provided by the municipality on behalf of a correctional facility.
Title
An Act Concerning Payments From The Department Of Correction To A Municipality That Provides Ambulance Services On Behalf Of A Correctional Facility.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Sen. John Kissel [R] | Rep. Kurt Vail [R] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] |
Rep. Tami Zawistowski [R] | Rep. Carol Hall [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. William Petit [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 228 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 172 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 172 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Public Act 19-9 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | House Calendar Number 620 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | File Number 808 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 400 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/03 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |