CT SB01121 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - File Number 920
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - File Number 920
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a Transportation Strategy and Advisory Board and require the State Bond Commission to authorize certain amounts of bond issuances for transportation projects.
Title
An Act Concerning "prioritize Progress".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | File Number 920 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 549 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/20/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/26 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |