CT SB01130 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require The University of Connecticut to undertake initiatives emphasizing entrepreneurship to assist in the economic development of the state and educating students to meet the state's present and projected future workforce needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Various Initiatives At The University Of Connecticut And Priority For Grants-in-aid From The Higher Education Entrepreneurship Advisory Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 335 AS AMENDED (Y: 130 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 286 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 10416 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 287 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 10369 (Y: 9 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 294 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24SenatePublic Act 19-154
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-01SenateHouse Calendar Number 713
2019-06-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-31SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-31SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-31SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 10369
2019-05-31SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 10416
2019-05-31SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10215
2019-05-20SenateFile Number 922
2019-05-20SenateSenate Calendar Number 551
2019-05-20SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-20SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/20/19 10:00 AM
2019-05-02SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-01SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-25SenatePublic Hearing 04/29
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback