CT SB01138 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - File Number 928
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - File Number 928
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement certain community restoration and revitalization efforts through community development corporations, community development credit unions and community impact zones, using tax revenue from the sale of cannabis and cannabis products and deposits in lieu of taxes.
Title
An Act Concerning Community Restoration Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | File Number 928 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 557 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/20/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/29 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |