CT SJ00022 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Toni M. Fatone Of West Hartford To Be A Workers' Compensation Commissioner.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Toni M. Fatone Of West Hartford To Be A Workers' Compensation Commissioner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 19 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 22 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 22 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Adopted, House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 48 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 24 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary |