CT SJ00029 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Carleton J. Giles Of Middletown To Be A Member And The Chairperson Of The Board Of Pardons And Paroles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Carleton J. Giles Of Middletown To Be A Member And The Chairperson Of The Board Of Pardons And Paroles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 101 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 90 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateIn Concurrence
2019-05-14SenateAdopted, House
2019-05-10SenateHouse Calendar Number 536
2019-05-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-08SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-08SenateAdopted, Senate
2019-04-22SenateSenate Calendar Number 377
2019-04-22SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-15SenatePublic Hearing 04/15

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback