DC B21-0422 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill permits any District resident to pay in-state tuition and receive local financial aid for attendance at any school or campus within the University of the District of Columbia system, regardless of federal immigration status. To receive aid, the resident must have graduated from a secondary school or received an equivalent diploma within the District, and have lived in the District one year prior to the date of their enrollment application.
Title
Udc Dream Amendment Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Vincent Orange [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. LaRuby May [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-20 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017 |
2016-12-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-12-20 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2016-12-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-12-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0422 |
2016-12-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-02-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-01-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-10-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2015-10-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-10-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0422 Published in the DC Register |
2015-10-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2015-10-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |