DC B21-0610 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill adopts the National Association of Insurance Commissioner's Risk-Based Capital trend test ratio. It requires that fraternal benefit societies (any insurance company licensed under the Fraternal Benefit Societies Act of 1998) are subject to the District's risk-based capital requirements. This revision is necessary for the District to maintain its accredited status with the National Association of Insurance commissioners.
Title
The Risk-based Capital Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-20 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017 |
2016-12-20 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-12-08 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-12-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0610 |
2016-12-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-11-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-11-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0610 |
2016-10-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-09-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-02-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs |
2016-02-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0610 Published in the DC Register |
2016-02-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |