DC B21-0885 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-09 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 25, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-09 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 25, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill prohibits a housing provider from receiving the 4-unit exemption if the eligibility for the exemption occurs after a transfer that is exempt from the Tenant Opportunity to Purchase Act (TOPA) and the housing provider has not provided a TOPA offer to the tenants. It also prohibits the charging of rents greater than allowed under the Rental Housing Act if a tenant has resided in the unit 90 days prior to the effective date of a transfer that is exempt from TOPA, regardless of the outcome of the TOPA offer.
Title
Four-unit Rental Housing Tenant Grandfathering Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-20 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 25, 2017 |
2016-12-20 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-12-06 | Council | First Reading |
2016-12-06 | Council | Amendment (Silverman) |
2016-11-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-11-28 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0885 |
2016-10-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-09-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-09-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0885 Published in the DC Register |
2016-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Community Development |
2016-09-20 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |