DC B21-0981 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - Signed with Act Number A21-0600
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - Signed with Act Number A21-0600
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Closing Of A Public Alley In Square 453, Emergency Act Of 2016
Title
Closing Of A Public Alley In Square 453, Emergency Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0600 |
2017-01-09 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0600 |
2016-12-27 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 11, 2017 |
2016-12-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-12-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-12-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |