DC B21-0983 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-09 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 25, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-09 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 25, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With W.M. Schlosser Company, Inc.
Title
W.m. Schlosser Company, Inc. Change Orders Nos. 1 And 2 To Contract Dcam-16-cs-0074 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 25, 2017 |
2016-12-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-12-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-12-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |