DC B21-0999 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Final Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Final Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Chancellor Of The District Of Columbia Public Schools Salary And Benefits Approval Temporary Amendment Act Of 2016
Title
Chancellor Of The District Of Columbia Public Schools Salary And Benefits Approval Temporary Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-12-30 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0999 Published in the DC Register |
2016-12-20 | Council | First Reading |
2016-12-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-12-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |