DC B22-0027 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Law Number L22-0061 Effective from February 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Law Number L22-0061 Effective from February 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-61 increases the minimum hours per week of registered public school nurses at District Public and Charter Schools to 40 hours per week.
FUNDING NOTE - This law was passed Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" Tab.
COMMITTEE REFERRAL INFORMATION
01/10/17 - Referred to the Committee on Education
02/21/17 - Re-referred sequentially to the Committee on Education and the Committee on Health
04/04/17 - Re-referred to the Committee on Health with comments from the Committee on Education
Title
Public School Health Services Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Council | Law Number L22-0061 Effective from February 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 14, 2018 |
2018-01-12 | Council | Act A22-0222 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 127 |
2018-01-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 14, 2018 |
2017-12-28 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0222 |
2017-12-28 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0222 |
2017-12-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 28, 2017 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-11-07 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-10-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-10-05 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0027 |
2017-04-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-04-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0027 |
2017-03-23 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-03-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0027 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-10 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |