DC B22-0099 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0119 Effective from July 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0119 Effective from July 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes the Affordable Cooperative Task Force to provide policy recommendations on improving existing limited equity cooperatives (a type of shared home ownership in which individuals purchase a share in a cooperative at an affordable cost); ensure the appropriate training and provision of technical assistance and management support to cooperatives; and issue recommendations on how the District can assist in the formation of new affordable cooperatives.
Title
Affordable Cooperative Task Force Act Of 2017 (now Known As "limited-equity Cooperative Task Force Act Of 2018")
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Law Number L22-0119 Effective from July 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018 |
2018-05-11 | Council | Act A22-0338 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5074 |
2018-05-07 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0338 |
2018-05-07 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0338 |
2018-04-24 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 8, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-03-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-02-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-02-23 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0099 |
2017-11-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0099 Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2017-02-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |