DC B22-0117 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0127 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0127 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill designates the alley between Massachusetts Avenue and C Streets N.E., as Walter Alley. The alley to be designated is in Ward 6.
Title
Walter Alley Designation Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Law Number L22-0127 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-04 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Council | Act A22-0346 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5753 |
2018-05-15 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0346 |
2018-05-15 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0346 |
2018-05-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-04-10 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-04-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-03-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0117 |
2018-02-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-02-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-23 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-02-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-17 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0117 Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |