DC B22-0223 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Enacted with Act Number A22-0608
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Enacted with Act Number A22-0608
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes a working group consisting of DC Water and Sewer Authority, the District Department of Transportation, the Department of General Services, the Department of Parks and Recreation, and the Department of public works to make decisions concerning site selection and procurement for the installation of public restroom facilities. The bill also requires the Mayor to establish a financial incentive program to encourage private businesses to make their restrooms available to the public for free.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Public Restroom Facilities Installation And Promotion Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0608 |
2019-01-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 30, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-12-18 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau) |
2018-12-04 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-28 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0223 |
2018-11-20 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0223 |
2018-01-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-12-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0223 Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-04-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |