DC B22-0255 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed with Act Number A22-0614
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed with Act Number A22-0614
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill brings the District into compliance with the federal requirement that child welfare agencies consider a child identified as a sex trafficking victim to also be a victim of neglect and sexual abuse regardless of whether the perpetrator is a parent, guardian or custodian.
Title
Child Neglect And Sex Trafficking Amendment Act Of 2017 (now Known As "omnibus Public Safety And Justice Amendment Act Of 2018")
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0614 |
2019-01-30 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0614 |
2019-01-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 30, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-12-18 | Council | Amendment (Allen) |
2018-12-04 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-28 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0255 |
2017-06-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-05-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0255 Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-04-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |