DC B22-0276 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed with Act Number A22-0615
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed with Act Number A22-0615
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires the Commissioner of the Department of Insurance, Securities and Banking to value certain contracts on an annual basis based on the standard required in the valuation manual. It requires the valuation manual to specify definitions and minimum valuation standards for policies and contracts. It expands the Commissioner's authority to require companies to adjust their reserves and establish reserves as specified in the valuation manual. It allows the Commissioner to share and receive confidential information for enforcement purposes. Among other things it also requires companies to certify via actuary that the company's reserves and related actuarial items are computed properly.
Title
Principal-based Reserves Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0615 |
2019-01-30 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0615 |
2019-01-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 30, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-12-04 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0276 |
2018-10-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0276 Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2017-05-02 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |