DC B22-0312 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on January 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is May 23, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on January 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is May 23, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires that the District Department of Corrections, the District of Columbia Office on Returning Citizens Affairs, and the District of Columbia Courts develop notification requirements to provide verbal and written notification to non-incarcerated individuals with felony convictions of their right to vote.
Title
D.c. Voting Rights Notification Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is May 23, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Council | Act A22-0565 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 909 |
2019-01-16 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0565 |
2019-01-16 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0565 |
2018-12-31 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 17, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-12-04 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-16 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-15 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0312 |
2018-01-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-12-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0312 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-06-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |