DC B22-0395 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0121 Effective from July 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0121 Effective from July 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-121 requires that the Office of Contracting and Procurement maintain an internet site that provides readable and searchable information on certain solicitations and contracts including related laws, rules, and policies. It also requires that any contract awarded by a District agency include a standard contract clause obligating the contractor to include a dispute-resolution clause in any contract that it enters into with a subcontractor.
FUNDING NOTE - This legislation is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement under "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Accessible And Transparent Procurement Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Law Number L22-0121 Effective from July 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018 |
2018-05-11 | Council | Act A22-0340 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5083 |
2018-05-07 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0340 |
2018-05-07 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0340 |
2018-04-24 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 8, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Council | Amendment (McDuffie) |
2018-04-10 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-04-10 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2018-03-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-03-06 | Council | Postponed to the next Legislative Meeting |
2018-02-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0395 |
2018-02-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-11-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0395 Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-07-11 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |