DC B22-0480 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0540 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0540 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill authorizes a health occupations board to discipline a health professional who has financially exploited a patient, client or employer and provides for the summary suspension or restriction of the license, registration, or certification of a professional who financially exploits another without a hearing.
Title
Vulnerable Population And Employer Protection Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Council | Act A22-0540 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 197 |
2019-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0540 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0540 |
2018-12-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 28, 2018 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-12-04 | Council | Amendment (Allen) |
2018-11-13 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0480 |
2018-07-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-06-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0480 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-09-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |