DC B22-0504 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on October 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes a student debt loan forgiveness program, the District of Columbia Student Loan Debt Forgiveness Program. The bill lists eligibility requirements, specifies that OSSE and the Student Loan Ombudsman will administer the program, and limits the award to 100% of the borrowers federal income-driven repayment plan for up to 60 months.
Title
Student Loan Debt Forgiveness Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0504 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-10-03 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0504 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38912/B22-0504-Introduction.pdf |