DC B22-0552 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0087 Effective from April 25, 2018, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0087 Effective from April 25, 2018, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This legislation classifies hearing examiners within the Office of Employee Appeals as legal service employees. It also requires that hearing examiners are licensed to practice law in DC.
FUNDING NOTE - This law was passed Subject to Appropriations. See Bill 22-754 for funding certification and Bill 22-753 for "Subject to Appropriations" repealer language
Title
Office Of Employee Appeals Hearing Examiner Classification Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Council | Law Number L22-0087 Effective from April 25, 2018, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Council | Act A22-0270 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2368 |
2018-02-28 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0270 |
2018-02-28 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0270 |
2018-02-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-01-09 | Council | First Reading |
2017-12-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-12-18 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0552 |
2017-11-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-11-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0552 Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2017-11-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |