DC B22-0591 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0149 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0149 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill exempts property owned by SOME, Inc., located at 1338 R Street, N.W., and known as Anna Cooper House, from the Tenant Opportunity to Purchase Act of 1980. This property provides affordable long-term housing to its residents.
Title
Anna Cooper House Topa Exemption Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Law Number L22-0149 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-04 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-01 | Council | Act A22-0376 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5993 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0376 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0376 |
2018-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-04-10 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-03-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-03-26 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0591 |
2018-02-23 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-02-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0591 Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2017-11-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |