DC B22-0628 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill criminalizes synthetic drugs based on the class of the chemical compound, including variants of fentanyl.
Title
Revised Synthetics Abatement And Full Enforcement Drug Control Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Council | Act A22-0569 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 937 |
2019-01-16 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0569 |
2019-01-16 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0569 |
2018-12-31 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 17, 2019 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-13 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-02 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0628 |
2018-07-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0628 Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-12-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |