DC B22-0635 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0167 Effective from October 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0167 Effective from October 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-167 revises the location of the District's Ward 1 Short-term Family Housing program to 2500 14th Street, NW., adds units to the shelter, and also adds housing for seniors.
Title
Homeless Shelter Replacement Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Council | Law Number L22-0167 Effective from October 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018 |
2018-09-17 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018 |
2018-09-14 | Council | Act A22-0441 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 9386 |
2018-09-05 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0441 |
2018-09-05 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0441 |
2018-08-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on September 5, 2018 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-06-26 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-06-04 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-05-31 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0635 |
2018-03-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-02-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0635 Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Human Services |
2017-12-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |