DC B22-0680 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Act A22-0266, Expires on May 21, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2119
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Act A22-0266, Expires on May 21, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2119
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defending Access To Women's Health Care Services Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Title
Defending Access To Women's Health Care Services Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Council | Act A22-0266, Expires on May 21, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2119 |
2018-02-21 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0266 |
2018-02-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0266 |
2018-02-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-02-12 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 27, 2018 |
2018-02-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-02-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |