DC B22-0687 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes an Adverse Childhood Experiences Task Force to study policies and practices in pediatric settings designed to mitigate conditions arising from toxic stressors and adverse childhood experiences.
Title
Adverse Childhood Experiences Task Force Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-06-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0687 Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2018-02-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0687 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39681/B22-0687-Introduction.pdf |