DC B22-0690 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Final Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill requires the Department of Health to conduct a study to evaluate availability of affordable long-term care facilities, services and supports for residents of the District of Columbia. Among other things the study will provide a projection of the number of DC residents who will require facility-based and home and community-based long-term care services over the next 10 years and provide any recommendations deemed appropriate for the development of needed service capacity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study Of Long-term Care Services And Supports Act Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-11-13CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-10-19CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-10-04CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0690
2018-06-22CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2018-06-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-02-23CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-02-09CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0690 Published in the DC Register
2018-02-06CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2018-02-06CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback