DC B22-0692 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes the Youth Mentoring Initiative in the Office of Out of School Time Grants and Youth Outcomes to coordinate and expand programs and public/private partnerships supporting youth mentoring programs and opportunities for at-risk youth. The initiative's functions include: assisting programs in developing and submitting grant applications, providing general assistance in recruiting mentors from public and private sector organizations and serving as an advocate for the youth mentoring community.
Title
Youth Mentoring Initiative Establishment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0692 Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-02-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0692 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39686/B22-0692-Introduction.pdf |