DC B22-0739 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-01 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-01 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill prevents certain transfers of bankruptcy sales of housing accommodations from being exempt from the Tenant Opportunity to Purchase Act of 1980.
Title
Topa Bankruptcy Tenant Displacement Prevention Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-05-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0739 Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2018-03-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0739 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39836/B22-0739-Introduction.pdf |