DC B22-0778 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-13 - Motion to Table (Evans)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-13 - Motion to Table (Evans)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill will make 16 and 17 year old residents eligible to vote.
Title
Youth Vote Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-13 - Council - Motion to Table (Evans) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-13 | Council | Motion to Table (Evans) |
2018-11-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0778 |
2018-06-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-05-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0778 Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2018-04-10 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0778 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40028/B22-0778-Introduction.pdf |
Roll Call | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0778 |