DC B22-0796 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Act A22-0360, Expires on August 19, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5951
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Act A22-0360, Expires on August 19, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5951
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Adult Learners Transit Benefits Enrollment Agreement Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2018
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Adult Learners Transit Benefits Enrollment Agreement Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Council | Act A22-0360, Expires on August 19, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5951 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0360 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0360 |
2018-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-05-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-04-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |