DC B22-0797 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Act A22-0361, Expires on August 19, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5953
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Act A22-0361, Expires on August 19, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5953
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With PFC Associates, LLC
Title
Modification Nos. 20 And 21 To Contract No. Dcfa-2015-c-2292-ss/cw37092 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Council | Act A22-0361, Expires on August 19, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5953 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0361 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0361 |
2018-05-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-05-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-04-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |