DC B22-0804 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires an owner who converts a housing accommodation containing 10 or fewer units resulting in a reduction of the number of units in the housing accommodation, shall pay the Mayor an additional conversion fee of 5% of the appraised value of the most valuable unit in the building multiplied by the net decrease in units. The Mayor is required to deposit the payment in the Housing Production Trust Fund.
Title
Housing Conversion And Eviction Clarification Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-08-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-08-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-05-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0804 Published in the DC Register |
2018-05-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2018-05-01 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0804 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40182/B22-0804-Introduction.pdf |