DC B22-0805 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes a pilot program within the Office of the Chief Technology Officer for veterans to acquire skills, knowledge, and experience necessary to enter the cybersecurity field.
Title
Veterans Cyber Academy Pilot Program Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-05-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0805 Published in the DC Register |
2018-05-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-01 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0805 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40183/B22-0805-Introduction.pdf |