DC B22-0841 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Signed with Act Number A22-0599
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Signed with Act Number A22-0599
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill limits the number of days per year for which temporary visitor parking permits may be issued to a single residential address to 30 days.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Temporary Parking Limitation Regulation Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0599 |
2019-01-24 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0599 |
2019-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 28, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-12-04 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-27 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0841 |
2018-11-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-11-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-06-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0841 Published in the DC Register |
2018-06-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2018-06-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |