DC B22-0953 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed with Act Number A22-0625
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed with Act Number A22-0625
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill symbolically designates the 1300 block of W Street, N.W., in Ward 1, as Anthony Bowen Way
Title
Anthony Bowen Way Designation Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0625 |
2019-01-30 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0625 |
2019-01-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 30, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-12-17 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-12-04 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0953 |
2018-12-04 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0953 Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |