DC B22-0959 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Signed with Act Number A22-0602
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Signed with Act Number A22-0602
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill exempts certain health care projects of the District of Columbia and District Hospital Partners, LP, doing business as George Washington University Hospital from the Certificate of Need process.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
East End Health Equity Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Gray) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Motion to Table (Evans) (Y: 3 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment #2 (Gray) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment (T. White) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment #1 (Gray) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Motion to postpone to 12/18/18 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - Amendment (Evans) (Y: 3 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-11-13 - Council - Motion to Table to 12/4/18 Meeting (Evans) (Y: 5 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Motion to Table (Evans) (Y: 3 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment #2 (Gray) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment (T. White) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment #1 (Gray) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Motion to postpone to 12/18/18 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - Amendment (Evans) (Y: 3 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-11-13 - Council - Motion to Table to 12/4/18 Meeting (Evans) (Y: 5 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0602 |
2019-01-24 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0602 |
2019-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 28, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-12-18 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Gray) |
2018-12-18 | Council | Amendment (Silverman) |
2018-12-18 | Council | Amendment (Gray) |
2018-12-18 | Council | Motion to Table (Evans) |
2018-12-04 | Council | Amendment (T. White) |
2018-12-04 | Council | Amendment (Silverman) |
2018-12-04 | Council | Amendment #2 (Gray) |
2018-12-04 | Council | Amendment #1 (Gray) |
2018-12-04 | Council | Motion to postpone to 12/18/18 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Amendment (Evans) |
2018-11-13 | Council | First Reading |
2018-11-13 | Council | Motion to Table to 12/4/18 Meeting (Evans) |
2018-11-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0959 |
2018-10-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0959 Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2018-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |