DC B22-0963 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0545 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 214
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0545 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 214
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill authorizes the relocation of the public-use easement recorded pursuant to the Closing of a Public Alley in Square 696, S.O. 07-8302 to the location shown on the Passageway Easement Plat.
Title
Relocation Of A Passageway Easement In Square 696 Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-20 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-20 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Council | Act A22-0545 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 214 |
2019-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0545 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0545 |
2018-12-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 28, 2018 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0963 |
2018-11-20 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-10-23 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0963 Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |