DC B22-0967 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-01 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-01 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires that schools adopt and implement a policy to prevent and address peer-to-peer sexual harassment, sexual assault, and dating violence among students. The policy should include a statement prohibiting sexual harassment, sexual assault, or dating violence among students and a protocol of how to respond to allegations. It also requires staff development training.
Title
Student Safety And Consent Education Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-09-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0967 Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0967 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40969/B22-0967-Introduction.pdf |