DC B22-0972 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill prohibits a provider from engaging in sexual orientation change efforts for a consumer for whom a conservator or guardian has been appointed.
Title
Conversion Therapy For Consumers Under A Conservatorship Or Guardianship Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Council | Act A22-0573 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 971 |
2019-01-16 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0573 |
2019-01-16 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0573 |
2018-12-31 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 17, 2019 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-13 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0972 |
2018-10-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2018-09-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0972 Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |