DC B22-1033 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Act A22-0528, Expires on March 10, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Act A22-0528, Expires on March 10, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled Substance Testing Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Title
Controlled Substance Testing Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-13 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-14 | Council | Act A22-0528, Expires on March 10, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13431 |
2018-12-10 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0528 |
2018-12-10 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0528 |
2018-11-26 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 10, 2018 |
2018-11-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-11-13 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-11-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-1033 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/41281/B22-1033-Introduction.pdf |
Roll Call | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-1033 |