DC B22-1071 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed with Act Number A22-0630
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed with Act Number A22-0630
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sports Wagering Lottery Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Title
Sports Wagering Lottery Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0630 |
2019-01-30 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0630 |
2019-01-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 30, 2019 |
2019-01-08 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-12-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |