DC B23-0012 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Law L23-0019, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12634
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Law L23-0019, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12634
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 23-19 proposes the closing of a portion of a public street adjacent to Squares 3760 and 3766, bounded by Riggs Road, Chillum Place, and Kennedy Street in Northeast Washington D.C. in Ward 4.
Title
Closing of a Portion of South Dakota Avenue, N.E., Adjacent to Squares 3760 and 3766 Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Council - Postponed until July 9, 2019 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Council - Postponed until July 9, 2019 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Council | Law L23-0019, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12634 |
2019-08-02 | Council | Act A23-0094 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9720 |
2019-07-30 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-07-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-07-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0094 |
2019-07-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2019 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-06-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-06-25 | Council | Postponed to July 9, 2019 |
2019-06-04 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2019-06-04 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0012 |
2019-01-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0012 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |