DC B23-0023 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Law L23-0109, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8970
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Law L23-0109, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8970
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 23-109 designates the alley within Square 514, bounded by 5th Street, N.W., M Street, N.W., 4th Street, N.W., and New York Avenue, N.W. in Ward 6, as Crowdy Court.
Title
Crowdy Court Designation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-24 | Council | Law L23-0109, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8970 |
2020-05-15 | Council | Act A23-0300 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5055 |
2020-05-12 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-05-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-04-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0300 |
2020-04-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020 |
2020-04-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-03-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-03-03 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-03-03 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0023 |
2020-01-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-12-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0023 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |